Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1912 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1912


 AN ACT
 relating to employment of a statewide data coordinator in the
 Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.0286 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.0286.  STATEWIDE DATA COORDINATOR. (a)  The
 executive director, using existing department funds, shall employ a
 statewide data coordinator to:
 (1)  improve the control and security of information
 collected by state agencies;
 (2)  promote between state agencies the sharing of
 information, including customer information; and
 (3)  reduce information collection costs incurred by
 this state.
 (b)  The statewide data coordinator shall develop and
 implement best practices among state agencies to:
 (1)  improve interagency information coordination;
 (2)  reduce duplicative information collection;
 (3)  increase accountability and ensure compliance
 with statutes and rules requiring agencies to share information;
 (4)  improve information management and analysis to
 increase information security, uncover fraud and waste, reduce
 agency costs, improve agency operations, and verify compliance with
 applicable laws;
 (5)  encourage agencies to collect and post on the
 agencies' Internet websites information related to agency
 functions that is in an open file format and is machine-readable,
 exportable, and easily accessible by the public; and
 (6)  encourage the evaluation of open document formats
 for storing data and documents generated by state agencies.
 (c)  Each state agency shall cooperate with the statewide
 data coordinator in fulfilling the requirements of this section.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive director of the Department of
 Information Resources shall employ a statewide data coordinator as
 required by Section 2054.0286, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1912 was passed by the House on April
 23, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1912 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1912 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor