Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1929 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 1929
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1929 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment in certain counties of expenses associated
 with the transportation of senior citizens and their caregivers for
 civic, community, educational, and recreational activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 615.022, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 615.022.  TRANSPORTATION EXPENSES OF CERTAIN COUNTIES
 FOR SENIOR CITIZENS. The commissioners court of a county with a
 population of 2.2 [3.3] million or more may pay out of the county
 general funds costs and expenses for the transportation of senior
 citizens and their caregivers for civic, community, educational,
 and recreational activities within and outside the county if a
 majority of the costs and expenses paid are for the transportation
 of senior citizens.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *