Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1934 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1934
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 5, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Beef Promotion and Research Council of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.102, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 41.102.  SUSPENSION OR REVOCATION OF LICENSE. In
 addition to other remedies provided by law, a violation of any
 provision of Subchapters B-E or H [of this chapter] is grounds for
 suspension or revocation of any license or permit issued by the
 commissioner. The suspension or revocation shall be conducted in
 accordance with the procedures provided by law for suspension or
 revocation on the basis of other grounds.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 41, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.1565 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.1565.  MEETINGS BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL. (a)
 Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, the council or a
 committee established by the council may hold an open or closed
 meeting by telephone conference call if the convening at one
 location of a quorum of the council or committee is inconvenient for
 any member of the council or committee.
 (b)  The meeting is subject to the notice requirements
 applicable to other meetings.
 (c)  The notice of the meeting must specify as the location
 of the meeting the location where meetings of the council or
 committee, as applicable, are usually held.
 (d)  Each part of the meeting that is required to be open to
 the public shall be audible to the public at the location specified
 in the notice of the meeting as the location of the meeting and the
 audio shall be recorded. The audio recording shall be made
 available to the public.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 41.102, Agriculture Code, applies only to conduct that occurs on or
 after the effective date of this Act. Conduct that occurs before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the conduct occurs, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *