Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1992 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zerwas, Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1992
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 14, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1992 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the granting of undergraduate course credit by advanced
 placement examination at public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.968, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  In establishing the minimum required score on an
 Advanced Placement examination for granting course credit for a
 particular lower-division course under Subsection (c), an
 institution of higher education may not require a score of more than
 three unless the institution's chief academic officer determines,
 based on evidence, that a higher score on the examination is
 necessary to indicate a student is sufficiently prepared to be
 successful in a related, more advanced course for which the
 lower-division course is a prerequisite.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0518 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0518.  STUDY ON UNDERGRADUATE COURSE CREDIT FOR
 ADVANCED PLACEMENT EXAMINATIONS. (a) In this section, "Advanced
 Placement examination" has the meaning assigned by Section 51.968.
 (b)  The board, in consultation with institutions of higher
 education, the board's Undergraduate Education Advisory Committee,
 and other interested parties, shall conduct a study on the
 performance of undergraduate students at institutions of higher
 education who receive undergraduate course credit for achieving
 required scores on one or more Advanced Placement examinations.
 (c)  The study must compare the academic performance,
 retention rates, and graduation rates at institutions of higher
 education of students who complete a lower-division course at an
 institution and students who receive credit for that course for a
 score of three or more on an Advanced Placement examination,
 disaggregated by score.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education shall submit to the
 board any data requested by the board as necessary for the board to
 carry out its duties under this section.
 (e)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the board shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the standing legislative committees with
 primary jurisdiction over higher education a progress report that
 examines the academic performance at institutions of higher
 education of students who received undergraduate course credit for
 a score of three on one or more Advanced Placement examinations and
 any recommendations for legislative or administrative action.
 (f)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the board shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the standing legislative committees with
 primary jurisdiction over higher education a report regarding the
 results of the study conducted under this section and any
 recommendations for legislative or administrative action.
 (g)  The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section in a manner that ensures compliance with federal law
 regarding confidentiality of student educational information,
 including the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20
 U.S.C. Section 1232g).
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.968(c-1), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to entering freshman students at institutions of
 higher education beginning with the 2016 fall semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *