H.B. No. 1992 AN ACT relating to the granting of undergraduate course credit by advanced placement examination at public institutions of higher education. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 51.968, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (c-1) In establishing the minimum required score on an Advanced Placement examination for granting course credit for a particular lower-division course under Subsection (c), an institution of higher education may not require a score of more than three unless the institution's chief academic officer determines, based on evidence, that a higher score on the examination is necessary to indicate a student is sufficiently prepared to be successful in a related, more advanced course for which the lower-division course is a prerequisite. SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.0518 to read as follows: Sec. 61.0518. STUDY ON UNDERGRADUATE COURSE CREDIT FOR ADVANCED PLACEMENT EXAMINATIONS. (a) In this section, "Advanced Placement examination" has the meaning assigned by Section 51.968. (b) The board, in consultation with institutions of higher education, the board's Undergraduate Education Advisory Committee, and other interested parties, shall conduct a study on the performance of undergraduate students at institutions of higher education who receive undergraduate course credit for achieving required scores on one or more Advanced Placement examinations. (c) The study must compare the academic performance, retention rates, and graduation rates at institutions of higher education of students who complete a lower-division course at an institution and students who receive credit for that course for a score of three or more on an Advanced Placement examination, disaggregated by score. (d) Each institution of higher education shall submit to the board any data requested by the board as necessary for the board to carry out its duties under this section. (e) Not later than January 1, 2017, the board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over higher education a progress report that examines the academic performance at institutions of higher education of students who received undergraduate course credit for a score of three on one or more Advanced Placement examinations and any recommendations for legislative or administrative action. (f) Not later than January 1, 2019, the board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over higher education a report regarding the results of the study conducted under this section and any recommendations for legislative or administrative action. (g) The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement this section in a manner that ensures compliance with federal law regarding confidentiality of student educational information, including the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20 U.S.C. Section 1232g). (h) This section expires September 1, 2019. SECTION 3. Section 51.968(c-1), Education Code, as added by this Act, applies to entering freshman students at institutions of higher education beginning with the 2016 fall semester. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1992 was passed by the House on April 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 10, 3 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1992 on May 21, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 10, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1992 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor