Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1993 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2015

                    By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 1993
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 11, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1993 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authorization of independent school districts to
 use electronic means to notify parents of a student's academic
 performance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.022, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A district that uses an electronic platform for
 communicating student grade and performance information to parents
 may permit a parent to sign a notice required under Subsections
 (a)(2) and (a)(3) electronically, so long as the district retains a
 record verifying the parent's acknowledgment of the required
 notice. A district that accepts electronic signatures under this
 subsection must offer parents the option to provide a handwritten
 signature as provided under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *