Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2000 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2000
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of certain commodity items by an entity
 other than a state agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2157.068, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  The following entities may purchase commodity items
 through the department, and be charged a reasonable administrative
 fee, as provided by this section:
 (1)  the Electric Reliability Council of Texas;
 (2)  the Lower Colorado River Authority;
 (3)  a private school, as defined by Section 5.001,
 Education Code;
 (4)  a private or independent institution of higher
 education, as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code; or
 (5)  a volunteer fire department, as defined by Section
 152.001, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *