Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2023 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R22927 GCB-D
 By: Naishtat, Price H.B. No. 2023
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2023:
 By:  Crownover C.S.H.B. No. 2023


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of a forensic director responsible for
 statewide coordination and oversight of forensic mental health
 services overseen by the Department of State Health Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 532, Health and Safety Code, as amended
 by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is
 amended by adding Sections 532.0024 and 532.0025 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 532.0024.  FORENSIC DIRECTOR. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Forensic patient" means a person with mental
 illness who is:
 (A)  examined on the issue of competency to stand
 trial by an expert appointed under Subchapter B, Chapter 46B, Code
 of Criminal Procedure;
 (B)  found incompetent to stand trial under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (C)  committed to court-ordered mental health
 services under Subchapter E, Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal
 Procedure; or
 (D)  found not guilty by reason of insanity under
 Chapter 46C, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (2)  "Forensic services" means a competency
 examination, competency restoration services, or mental health
 services provided to a current or former forensic patient in the
 community or at a department facility.
 (b)  The commissioner shall appoint a forensic director.
 (c)  To be qualified for appointment as forensic director, a
 person must have proven expertise in the social, health, and legal
 systems for forensic patients, and in the intersection of those
 systems.
 (d)  The forensic director reports to the commissioner and is
 responsible for:
 (1)  statewide coordination and oversight of forensic
 services;
 (2)  any programs operated by the department relating
 to evaluation of forensic patients, transition of forensic patients
 from inpatient to outpatient or community-based services,
 community forensic monitoring, or forensic research and training;
 and
 (3)  addressing issues with the delivery of forensic
 services in the state, including:
 (A)  significant increases in populations with
 serious mental illness and criminal justice system involvement;
 (B)  adequate availability of department
 facilities for civilly committed forensic patients;
 (C)  wait times for forensic patients who require
 competency restoration services;
 (D)  interruption of mental health services of
 recently released forensic patients; and
 (E)  coordination of services provided to
 forensic patients by state agencies.
 Sec. 532.0025.  FORENSIC WORKGROUP. (a) In this section,
 "forensic patient" and "forensic services" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 532.0024.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall establish a workgroup
 of experts and stakeholders to make recommendations concerning the
 creation of a comprehensive plan for the effective coordination of
 forensic services.
 (c)  The workgroup must have not fewer than nine members,
 with the executive commissioner selecting the total number of
 members at the time the executive commissioner establishes the
 workgroup.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall appoint as members of
 the workgroup:
 (1)  a representative of the department;
 (2)  a representative of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice;
 (3)  a representative of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department;
 (4)  a representative of the Texas Correctional Office
 on Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments;
 (5)  a representative of the Sheriff's Association of
 Texas;
 (6)  a superintendent of a state hospital with a
 maximum security forensic unit;
 (7)  a representative of a local mental health
 authority;
 (8)  a representative of the County Judges and
 Commissioners Association;
 (9)  a representative of the protection and advocacy
 system of this state established in accordance with 42 U.S.C.
 Section 15043, appointed by the administrative head of that system;
 and
 (10)  additional members as needed to comply with the
 number of members selected by the executive commissioner, who must
 be recognized experts in forensic patients or persons who represent
 the interests of forensic patients, and who may be advocates,
 family members, psychiatrists, psychologists, social workers,
 psychiatric nurses, or representatives of hospitals licensed under
 Chapter 241 or 577.
 (e)  In developing recommendations, the workgroup may use
 information compiled by, and shall collaborate and align efforts
 with, other workgroups in the state, especially workgroups for
 which the focus is mental health issues.
 (f)  Not later than July 1, 2016, the workgroup established
 under this section shall send a report describing the workgroup's
 recommendations to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the standing committees of the senate
 and the house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over
 forensic services.
 (g)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 (h)  The workgroup established under this section is
 dissolved and this section expires November 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than November 1, 2015, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall:
 (1)  establish a forensic workgroup and shall appoint
 members of that workgroup, as required by Section 532.0025, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  adopt any rules necessary for the implementation
 of Section 532.0024 or 532.0025, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The commissioner of state health services shall
 appoint a forensic director as required by Section 532.0024, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.