Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2027 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2015

                    By: Bonnen of Galveston, et al. H.B. No. 2027
 (Senate Sponsor - Hancock)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing precincts for elections held on a uniform
 election date by certain political subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.002, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The county election precincts are the election
 precincts for the following elections:
 (1)  the general election for state and county
 officers;
 (2)  a special election ordered by the governor;
 (3)  a primary election;
 (4)  a countywide election ordered by the commissioners
 court, county judge, or other county authority, except an election
 subject to Section 42.062(2); and
 (5)  as provided by Section 42.0621, any other election
 held by [on the November uniform election date of] a political
 subdivision on a uniform election date[, other than a district that
 is created under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59, Article
 XVI, Texas Constitution, and is located in a county with a
 population of more than 3.3 million or a county adjacent to a county
 with a population of more than 3.3 million].
 (c)  Subsection (a)(5) does not apply to an election held on
 the May uniform election date by a political subdivision that:
 (1)  conducts early voting by personal appearance at
 each permanent or temporary branch polling place on the same days
 and during the same hours as voting is conducted at the main early
 voting polling place; or
 (2)  has not established a permanent or temporary
 branch early voting polling place.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 42.0621, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0621.  PRECINCTS FOR ELECTIONS HELD ON A UNIFORM
 ELECTION DATE [NOVEMBER ELECTION].
 SECTION 3.  Section 42.0621(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In an election held on a [the November] uniform election
 date, the political subdivisions to which Section 42.002(a)(5)
 applies shall use the regular county election precincts.
 SECTION 4.  Section 43.004(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  If a political subdivision holds an election on a [the
 November] uniform election date and is required to use the regular
 county election precincts, the political subdivision shall
 designate as the polling places for the election the regular county
 polling places in the county election precincts that contain
 territory from the political subdivision.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *