Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2033 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2033
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 2; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2033 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing counties to require the submission of
 digital maps in connection with the county plat approval process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences the subdivision plat and related public
 infrastructure using the Texas Coordinate Systems adopted under
 Section 21.071, Natural Resources Code. A digital map required
 under this subsection may be required only in a format widely used
 by common geographic information system software. A requirement
 adopted under this subsection must provide for an exemption from
 the requirement if the owner of the tract submits with the plat
 application an acknowledged statement indicating that the digital
 mapping technology necessary to submit a map that complies with
 this subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.023, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences the subdivision plat and related public
 infrastructure using the Texas Coordinate Systems adopted under
 Section 21.071, Natural Resources Code. A digital map required
 under this subsection may be required only in a format widely used
 by common geographic information system software. A requirement
 adopted under this subsection must provide for an exemption from
 the requirement if the subdivider of the tract submits with the plat
 application an acknowledged statement indicating that the digital
 mapping technology necessary to submit a map that complies with
 this subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 3.  Section 232.072, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences the subdivision plat and related public
 infrastructure using the Texas Coordinate Systems adopted under
 Section 21.071, Natural Resources Code. A digital map required
 under this subsection may be required only in a format widely used
 by common geographic information system software. A requirement
 adopted under this subsection must provide for an exemption from
 the requirement if the owner of the tract submits with the plat
 application an acknowledged statement indicating that the digital
 mapping technology necessary to submit a map that complies with
 this subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *