Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2037 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2037


 AN ACT
 relating to compensation and leave for certain peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.009, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 402.009.  AUTHORITY TO EMPLOY AND COMMISSION PEACE
 OFFICERS. (a) The attorney general may employ and commission peace
 officers as investigators for the limited purpose of assisting the
 attorney general in carrying out the duties of that office relating
 to prosecution assistance and crime prevention.
 (b)  The attorney general shall ensure that a commissioned
 peace officer employed as authorized under Subsection (a) is
 compensated according to Schedule C of the position classification
 salary schedule prescribed by the General Appropriations Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 659.301(5), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (5)  "State employee" means an individual who:
 (A)  is a commissioned law enforcement officer of
 the Department of Public Safety, the Texas Facilities Commission,
 the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, [or] the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice, or the attorney general;
 (B)  is a commissioned security officer of the
 comptroller;
 (C)  is a law enforcement officer commissioned by
 the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
 (D)  is a commissioned peace officer of an
 institution of higher education;
 (E)  is an employee or official of the Board of
 Pardons and Paroles or the parole division of the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice if the employee or official has routine direct
 contact with inmates of any penal or correctional institution or
 with administratively released prisoners subject to the board's
 jurisdiction;
 (F)  has been certified to the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas under Section 815.505 as having begun
 employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial officer,
 unless the individual has been certified to the system as having
 ceased employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial
 officer; or
 (G)  before May 29, 1987, received hazardous duty
 pay based on the terms of any state law if the individual holds a
 position designated under that law as eligible for the pay.
 SECTION 3.  Section 661.918(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to a peace officer under Article
 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, who is commissioned as a law
 enforcement officer or agent, including a ranger, by:
 (1)  the Public Safety Commission and the director of
 the Department of Public Safety;
 (2)  the Parks and Wildlife Commission; [or]
 (3)  the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission; or
 (4)  the attorney general.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The classification officer in the office of
 the state auditor shall classify the position of commissioned peace
 officer employed as an investigator by the Office of the Attorney
 General as a Schedule C position under the Texas Position
 Classification Plan, 1961.
 (b)  The change made by the classification officer as
 required by this section applies beginning in the state fiscal
 biennium beginning September 1, 2015.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  Section 661.918(a), Government Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to an injury that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2037 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 120, Nays 25, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2037 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 5,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2037 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 6.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor