Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2050 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez of Travis H.B. No. 2050
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voter information provided by a voter registrar to the
 secretary of state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 18.069, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 18.069.  VOTING HISTORY.  Not later than the 30th day
 after the date of the primary, runoff primary, or general election
 or any special election ordered by the governor, the registrar
 shall electronically submit to the secretary of state the record of
 each voter participating in the election. The record must include a
 notation of whether the voter voted on election day, voted early by
 personal appearance, voted early by mail under Chapter 86, or voted
 early by mail under Chapter 101.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *