Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2066 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Oliveira, Fallon H.B. No. 2066
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2066By:  Whitmire By:  Whitmire
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rescission of nonjudicial foreclosure sales.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 51, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 51.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.016.  RESCISSION OF NONJUDICIAL FORECLOSURE SALES.
 (a) This section applies only to a nonjudicial foreclosure sale of
 residential real property conducted under Section 51.002. In this
 subsection, "residential real property" means:
 (1)  a single family home, duplex, triplex, or
 quadraplex; or
 (2)  a unit in a multiunit residential structure in
 which title to an individual unit is transferred to the owner of the
 unit under a condominium or cooperative system.
 (b)  Not later than the 15th calendar day after the date of a
 foreclosure sale, a mortgagee, trustee, or substitute trustee may
 rescind the sale under this section if:
 (1)  the statutory requirements for the sale were not
 satisfied;
 (2)  the default leading to the sale was cured before
 the sale;
 (3)  a receivership or dependent probate
 administration involving the property was pending at the time of
 sale;
 (4)  a condition specified in the conditions of sale
 prescribed by the trustee or substitute trustee before the sale and
 made available in writing to prospective bidders at the sale was not
 met;
 (5)  the mortgagee or mortgage servicer and the debtor
 agreed before the sale to cancel the sale based on an enforceable
 written agreement by the debtor to cure the default; or
 (6)  at the time of the sale, a court-ordered or
 automatic stay of the sale imposed in a bankruptcy case filed by a
 person with an interest in the property was in effect.
 (c)  On or before the 15th calendar day after the date of the
 sale, the party rescinding the sale shall:
 (1)  serve a written notice of rescission that
 describes the reason for the rescission and includes recording
 information for any affected trustee's or substitute trustee's deed
 that was recorded on:
 (A)  the purchaser, if the mortgagee is not the
 purchaser; and
 (B)  each debtor who, according to the records of
 the mortgage servicer of the debt, is obligated to pay the debt; and
 (2)  file each notice for recording in the real
 property records of the county in which all or a part of the
 property is located.
 (d)  A notice required by Subsection (c) must be served by
 certified mail.  Service of the notice is complete when the notice
 is deposited in the United States mail, postage prepaid and
 addressed to the purchaser or debtor, as applicable, at the
 purchaser's or debtor's last known address, as applicable.  The
 affidavit of a person knowledgeable of the facts to the effect that
 service was completed is prima facie evidence of service.
 (e)  Not later than the fifth calendar day after the date a
 foreclosure sale is rescinded under this section, the mortgagee
 shall return to the purchaser by certified mail, electronic or wire
 transfer, or courier service with delivery tracking the amount of
 the bid paid by the purchaser for the property at the sale.  The
 debtor shall return to the trustee the amount of any excess proceeds
 received by the debtor from the sale. The return of the bid amount
 is considered made on the date:
 (1)  the bid amount is deposited postage prepaid in the
 United States mail or with the courier service addressed to the
 purchaser at the purchaser's last known address; or
 (2)  the electronic or wire transfer is ordered.
 (f)  The rescinding mortgagee, trustee, or substitute
 trustee shall cause to be filed for recording in the real property
 records of the county where the notice required under Subsection
 (c) was recorded an affidavit stating the date the bid amount was
 returned together with the certified mail, electronic or wire
 transfer, or courier service delivery tracking information.
 (g)  An affidavit executed and filed in accordance with
 Subsection (f) is prima facie evidence of the return of the bid
 amount and of the authority of the maker of the affidavit. A bona
 fide purchaser, lender, or other person acquiring an interest in
 the property or an insurer of title is entitled to rely conclusively
 on the record of the filed affidavit and notice, and any subsequent
 purchaser in good faith and for value is entitled to bona fide
 purchaser protection.
 (h)  The rescission of a foreclosure sale under this section
 restores the mortgagee and the debtor to their respective title,
 rights, and obligations under any instrument relating to the
 foreclosed property that existed immediately prior to the sale.
 (i)  A rescission of a foreclosure sale under this section is
 void as to a creditor or to a subsequent purchaser for a valuable
 consideration without notice unless notice of the rescission has
 been acknowledged, sworn to, or proved and filed for recording as
 required by law. A rescission of a foreclosure sale under this
 section evidenced by an unrecorded instrument is binding on a party
 to the instrument, on the party's heirs, and on a subsequent
 purchaser who does not pay a valuable consideration or who has
 notice of the instrument.
 (j)  No action challenging the effectiveness of a rescission
 under this section may be commenced unless the action is filed on or
 before the 30th calendar day after the date the notices of
 rescission required by Subsection (c) are filed for recording. A
 lis pendens notice based on the rescission not recorded within that
 period has no effect. This subsection does not affect the
 limitations period for an action claiming damages resulting from
 the rescission.
 (k)  If the foreclosure sale is rescinded under this section
 for a reason listed in Subsection (b), other than a stay described
 by Subsection (b)(6), the court in a civil action filed by the
 purchaser challenging the effectiveness of the rescission or
 claiming damages resulting from the rescission may only award as
 damages to the purchaser the amount of the bid paid for the property
 by the purchaser at the sale that has not been refunded to the
 purchaser, plus interest on that amount at the rate of 10 percent
 per year.  Notwithstanding any other law, the court may not order
 specific performance of the sale as a remedy for the purchaser.
 Interest awarded under this subsection ceases to accrue on the
 fourth day after the date the mortgagee deposits the amount of the
 damages awarded in the United States mail or with a courier for
 delivery to the purchaser.
 (l)  If a foreclosure sale is rescinded under this section
 for a reason provided by Subsection (b)(6), the court in a civil
 action filed by the purchaser challenging the effectiveness of the
 rescission or claiming damages resulting from the rescission may
 only award as damages to the purchaser the amount of the bid paid
 for the property by the purchaser at the sale that has not been
 refunded to the purchaser.
 (m)  Nothing in this section prohibits the rescission of a
 sale by agreement of the affected parties on other terms or a suit
 to rescind a sale not rescinded under this section.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a foreclosure sale that occurs on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A foreclosure sale that occurred before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law applicable to the
 foreclosure sale immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *