Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2070 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris, Guillen H.B. No. 2070
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2070 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain requirements for certain facilities licensed by
 the Department of Family and Protective Services and the
 department's enforcement authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.0462 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0462.  WAIVER OF NOTICE AND HEARING REQUIREMENTS.
 To protect the safety and well-being of residents and employees of a
 general residential operation that provides comprehensive
 residential services to children who are victims of trafficking,
 the department shall waive the notice and hearing requirements
 imposed under Section 42.0461 for an applicant who submits to the
 department an application to provide trafficking victim services at
 the applicant's general residential operation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.054, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (d), and (e) and adding
 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall charge an applicant a
 nonrefundable application fee [of $35] for an initial license to
 operate a child-care facility or a child-placing agency.
 (b)  The department shall charge each child-care facility a
 fee [of $35] for an initial license. The department shall charge
 each child-placing agency a fee [of $50] for an initial license.
 (c)  The department shall charge each licensed child-care
 facility an annual license fee [in the amount of $35 plus $1 for
 each child the child-care facility is permitted to serve]. The fee
 is due on the date on which the department issues the child-care
 facility's initial license and on the anniversary of that date.
 (d)  The department shall charge each licensed child-placing
 agency an annual license fee [of $100]. The fee is due on the date on
 which the department issues the child-placing agency's initial
 license and on the anniversary of that date.
 (e)  The department shall charge each family home that is
 listed or registered with the department an annual fee [to cover a
 part of the department's cost in regulating family homes. The
 amount of the fee is $20 for a listed home or $35 for a registered
 home]. The fee is due on the date on which the department initially
 lists or registers the home and on the anniversary of that date.
 (h)  The executive commissioner by rule shall set fees under
 this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.0704 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0704.  ENFORCEMENT POLICY.  (a)  The executive
 commissioner by rule shall adopt a general enforcement policy that
 describes the department's approach to enforcement of this chapter.
 (b)  The enforcement policy must:
 (1)  summarize the department's general expectations in
 enforcing this chapter;
 (2)  include the methodology required by Subsection
 (c); and
 (3)  describe the department's plan for strengthening
 its enforcement efforts and for making objective regulatory
 decisions.
 (c)  As part of the enforcement policy, the department shall
 develop and implement a methodology for determining the appropriate
 disciplinary action to take against a person who violates this
 chapter or a department rule. The methodology must provide guidance
 on when to use each of the available tools of enforcement, including
 technical assistance, voluntary plans of action, evaluation,
 probation, suspension or revocation of a license or registration,
 denial of a license or registration, administrative penalties, and
 emergency suspension. The methodology must allow the department to
 consider the circumstances of a particular case, including the
 nature and seriousness of the violation, history of previous
 violations, and aggravating and mitigating factors, in determining
 the appropriate disciplinary action.
 (d)  The department shall make the methodology described by
 Subsection (c) available to the public, including by posting the
 methodology on the department's Internet website.
 SECTION 4.  Section 42.078(a-2), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The department may impose an administrative penalty
 without first imposing a nonmonetary administrative sanction for
 violating a minimum standard applicable to a facility or family
 home under this chapter that is determined by the department to be a
 high-risk standard, including background check standards, safety
 hazard standards, and supervision standards [the following
 violations:
 [(1)     failing to timely submit the information
 required to conduct a background and criminal history check under
 Section 42.056 and applicable department rules on two or more
 occasions;
 [(2)     failing to submit the information required
 to conduct a background and criminal history check under Section
 42.056 and applicable department rules before the 30th day after
 the date the facility or family home is notified by the department
 that the information is overdue;
 [(3)     except as provided by Section 42.056(g),
 knowingly allowing a person to be present in a facility or family
 home when the person's background and criminal history check has
 not been received;
 [(4)     knowingly allowing a person to be present in
 a facility or family home when the person's background and criminal
 history check has been received and contains criminal history or
 central registry findings that under department rules preclude the
 person from being present in the facility or family home; or
 [(5)     violating a condition or restriction the
 department places on a person's presence at a facility or family
 home as part of a pending or approved risk evaluation of the
 person's background and criminal history or central registry
 findings].
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter D, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.079.  CEASE AND DESIST ORDER. (a) If it appears to
 the department that a person who is not licensed, certified,
 registered, or listed under this chapter is operating a child-care
 facility or family home, the department, after notice and
 opportunity for a hearing, may issue a cease and desist order
 prohibiting the person from operating the facility or home.
 (b)  A violation of an order under this section constitutes
 grounds for imposing an administrative penalty under Section
 42.078.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *