Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2078 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 16, 2015      TO: Honorable Rafael Anchia, Chair, House Committee on International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2078 by Anchia (Relating to the creation and duties of the Global Climate Change Commission.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would create a new Global Climate Change Commission (GCCC) consisting of 23 members. Five members would be appointed individually by the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, most senior member of the minority party of the House of Representatives, and the most senior member of the minority party of the Senate. Eighteen additional members would be appointed evenly between the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and would be comprised of representatives from the following: the energy/electricity sector; environmental organizations; scientific academia, including one climatologist; economics academia; business and industry; manufacturing or mining; agriculture or forestry; fossil fuel industry; the Health and Human Services Commission; and the public. Members of the GCCC would not be entitled to compensation for service on the GCCC but would be entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses.The bill would require the GCCC to prepare and deliver a comprehensive inventory and forecast of greenhouse gas emissions from 2000 to 2030 to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the State Energy Conservation Office (SECO), and the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) by no later than September 1, 2016. The GCCC would also be tasked with designing an approach to: reduce greenhouse gas emissions; reduce energy demands; protect public health; increase investment in clean energy, energy efficiency, and sustainable infrastructure; assess the impact of climate change on national security; and develop and recommend policy options to reduce Texas' vulnerability to effects of climate change. The GCCC would be required to submit a preliminary report on its activities to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the SECO, and the TCEQ by no later than September 1, 2016, with a final report due to the legislature by January 1, 2017. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015. The GCCC would be abolished on March 1, 2017.No significant costs to the state are expected as a result of the bill's enactment.  Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 582 Commission on Environmental Quality   LBB Staff:  UP, FR, TL    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 16, 2015





  TO: Honorable Rafael Anchia, Chair, House Committee on International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2078 by Anchia (Relating to the creation and duties of the Global Climate Change Commission.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rafael Anchia, Chair, House Committee on International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2078 by Anchia (Relating to the creation and duties of the Global Climate Change Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rafael Anchia, Chair, House Committee on International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs 

 Honorable Rafael Anchia, Chair, House Committee on International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2078 by Anchia (Relating to the creation and duties of the Global Climate Change Commission.), As Introduced

HB2078 by Anchia (Relating to the creation and duties of the Global Climate Change Commission.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would create a new Global Climate Change Commission (GCCC) consisting of 23 members. Five members would be appointed individually by the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, most senior member of the minority party of the House of Representatives, and the most senior member of the minority party of the Senate. Eighteen additional members would be appointed evenly between the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and would be comprised of representatives from the following: the energy/electricity sector; environmental organizations; scientific academia, including one climatologist; economics academia; business and industry; manufacturing or mining; agriculture or forestry; fossil fuel industry; the Health and Human Services Commission; and the public. Members of the GCCC would not be entitled to compensation for service on the GCCC but would be entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses.The bill would require the GCCC to prepare and deliver a comprehensive inventory and forecast of greenhouse gas emissions from 2000 to 2030 to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the State Energy Conservation Office (SECO), and the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) by no later than September 1, 2016. The GCCC would also be tasked with designing an approach to: reduce greenhouse gas emissions; reduce energy demands; protect public health; increase investment in clean energy, energy efficiency, and sustainable infrastructure; assess the impact of climate change on national security; and develop and recommend policy options to reduce Texas' vulnerability to effects of climate change. The GCCC would be required to submit a preliminary report on its activities to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the SECO, and the TCEQ by no later than September 1, 2016, with a final report due to the legislature by January 1, 2017. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015. The GCCC would be abolished on March 1, 2017.No significant costs to the state are expected as a result of the bill's enactment. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 582 Commission on Environmental Quality

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 582 Commission on Environmental Quality

LBB Staff: UP, FR, TL

 UP, FR, TL