Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB21 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kacal, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 21
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays
 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 21 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing patients with certain terminal illnesses to
 access certain investigational drugs, biological products, and
 devices that are in clinical trials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  This Act shall be known as the Right To Try
 Act.
 (b)  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  the process for the approval of investigational
 drugs, biological products, and devices in the United States takes
 many years;
 (2)  patients with a terminal illness do not have the
 luxury of waiting until an investigational drug, biological
 product, or device receives final approval from the United States
 Food and Drug Administration;
 (3)  the standards of the United States Food and Drug
 Administration for the use of investigational drugs, biological
 products, and devices may deny the benefits of potentially
 life-saving treatments to terminally ill patients;
 (4)  patients with a terminal illness have a
 fundamental right to attempt to pursue the preservation of their
 own lives by accessing available investigational drugs, biological
 products, and devices;
 (5)  the use of available investigational drugs,
 biological products, and devices is a decision that should be made
 by the patient with a terminal illness in consultation with the
 patient's physician to pursue the preservation of the patient's own
 life and is not a decision to be made by the government; and
 (6)  the decision to use an investigational drug,
 biological product, or device should be made with full awareness of
 the potential risks, benefits, and consequences to the patient with
 a terminal illness and the patient's family.
 (c)  It is the intent of the legislature to allow for
 patients with a terminal illness to use potentially life-saving
 investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle C, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 489 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 489.  ACCESS TO INVESTIGATIONAL TREATMENTS FOR PATIENTS
 WITH TERMINAL ILLNESSES
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 489.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Investigational drug, biological product, or
 device" means a drug, biological product, or device that has
 successfully completed phase one of a clinical trial but has not yet
 been approved for general use by the United States Food and Drug
 Administration and remains under investigation in the clinical
 trial.
 (2)  "Terminal illness" means an advanced stage of a
 disease with an unfavorable prognosis that, without
 life-sustaining procedures, will soon result in death or a state of
 permanent unconsciousness from which recovery is unlikely.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  ACCESS TO INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, BIOLOGICAL
 PRODUCTS, AND DEVICES FOR PATIENTS WITH TERMINAL ILLNESSES
 Sec. 489.051.  PATIENT ELIGIBILITY. A patient is eligible
 to access and use an investigational drug, biological product, or
 device under this chapter if:
 (1)  the patient has a terminal illness, attested to by
 the patient's treating physician; and
 (2)  the patient's physician:
 (A)  in consultation with the patient, has
 considered all other treatment options currently approved by the
 United States Food and Drug Administration and determined that
 those treatment options are unavailable or unlikely to prolong the
 patient's life; and
 (B)  has recommended or prescribed in writing that
 the patient use a specific class of investigational drug,
 biological product, or device.
 Sec. 489.052.  INFORMED CONSENT. (a)  Before receiving an
 investigational drug, biological product, or device, an eligible
 patient must sign a written informed consent.  If the patient is a
 minor or lacks the mental capacity to provide informed consent, a
 parent or legal guardian may provide informed consent on the
 patient's behalf.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission by rule may adopt a form for the informed
 consent under this section.
 Sec. 489.053.  PROVISION OF INVESTIGATIONAL DRUG,
 BIOLOGICAL PRODUCT, OR DEVICE BY MANUFACTURER. (a)  A manufacturer
 of an investigational drug, biological product, or device may make
 available the manufacturer's investigational drug, biological
 product, or device to eligible patients in accordance with this
 chapter if the patient provides to the manufacturer the informed
 consent required under Section 489.052.
 (b)  This chapter does not require that a manufacturer make
 available an investigational drug, biological product, or device to
 an eligible patient.
 (c)  If a manufacturer makes available an investigational
 drug, biological product, or device to an eligible patient under
 this subchapter, the manufacturer must provide the investigational
 drug, biological product, or device to the eligible patient without
 receiving compensation.
 Sec. 489.054.  NO CAUSE OF ACTION CREATED. This chapter does
 not create a private or state cause of action against a manufacturer
 of an investigational drug, biological product, or device or
 against any other person or entity involved in the care of an
 eligible patient using the investigational drug, biological
 product, or device for any harm done to the eligible patient
 resulting from the investigational drug, biological product, or
 device.
 Sec. 489.055.  STATE MAY NOT INTERFERE WITH ACCESS TO
 INVESTIGATIONAL DRUG, BIOLOGICAL PRODUCT, OR DEVICE. An official,
 employee, or agent of this state may not block or attempt to block
 an eligible patient's access to an investigational drug, biological
 product, or device under this chapter.
 SUBCHAPTER C.  HEALTH INSURANCE
 Sec. 489.101.  EFFECT ON HEALTH CARE COVERAGE FOR CLINICAL
 TRIAL ENROLLEES. This chapter does not affect the coverage of
 enrollees in clinical trials under Chapter 1379, Insurance Code.
 SUBCHAPTER D.  PHYSICIANS
 Sec. 489.151.  ACTION AGAINST PHYSICIAN'S LICENSE
 PROHIBITED. Notwithstanding any other law, the Texas Medical Board
 may not revoke, fail to renew, suspend, or take any action against a
 physician's license under Subchapter B, Chapter 164, Occupations
 Code, based solely on the physician's recommendations to an
 eligible patient regarding access to or treatment with an
 investigational drug, biological product, or device, provided that
 the recommendations made to the patient meet the medical standard
 of care.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *