Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2115 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2015

                    By: Phillips, Fallon, Guillen H.B. No. 2115
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the initial inspection period for motor vehicles
 purchased by certain commercial fleet buyers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 548.102(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The initial inspection period is two years for a
 passenger car or light truck that:
 (1)  is sold in this state or purchased by a commercial
 fleet buyer described by Section 501.0234(b)(4) for use in this
 state;
 (2)  has not been previously registered in this or
 another state; and
 (3)  on the date of sale is of the current or preceding
 model year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *