Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2131 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Davis of Harris, Zerwas, Burkett H.B. No. 2131
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
 May 18, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas  9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of centers of excellence to achieve
 healthy fetal outcomes in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE
 FOR FETAL DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY
 Sec. 32.071.  DESIGNATION OF CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE FOR FETAL
 DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY. (a) The department, in consultation with
 the Perinatal Advisory Council established under Section 241.187,
 shall designate as centers of excellence for fetal diagnosis and
 therapy one or more health care entities in this state that provide
 comprehensive maternal, fetal, and neonatal health care for
 pregnant women with high-risk pregnancies complicated by one or
 more fetuses with anomalies, with genetic conditions, or with
 compromise caused by a pregnancy condition or by exposure.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission, in consultation with the department and the
 Perinatal Advisory Council, shall adopt the rules necessary for a
 health care entity in this state to be designated as a center of
 excellence for fetal diagnosis and therapy.
 Sec. 32.072.  SUBCOMMITTEE. (a) The department, in
 consultation with the Perinatal Advisory Council, shall appoint a
 subcommittee of that advisory council to advise the advisory
 council and the department on the development of rules related to
 the designations made by the department under this subchapter. As
 part of its duties under this subsection, the subcommittee
 specifically shall advise the advisory council and the department
 regarding the criteria necessary for a health care entity in this
 state to receive a designation under this subchapter.
 (b)  The subcommittee must consist of individuals with
 expertise in fetal diagnosis and therapy. A majority of the members
 of the subcommittee must practice in those areas in a health
 profession in this state. The subcommittee may include national and
 international experts.
 Sec. 32.073.  PRIORITY CONSIDERATIONS FOR CENTER
 DESIGNATIONS. The rules adopted under Section 32.071(b) must
 prioritize awarding a designation under this subchapter to a health
 care entity that:
 (1)  offers fetal diagnosis and therapy through an
 extensive multi-specialty clinical program that is affiliated and
 collaborates extensively with a medical school in this state and an
 associated hospital facility that provides advanced maternal and
 neonatal care in accordance with the rules established under
 Section 241.183(a)(1);
 (2)  demonstrates a significant commitment to research
 in and advancing the field of fetal diagnosis and therapy;
 (3)  offers advanced training programs in fetal
 diagnosis and therapy; and
 (4)  integrates an advanced fetal care program with a
 program that provides appropriate long-term monitoring and
 follow-up care for patients.
 Sec. 32.074.  QUALIFICATIONS FOR DESIGNATION.  The rules
 adopted under Section 32.071(b) must ensure that a designation
 under this subchapter is based directly on a health care entity's
 ability to:
 (1)  implement and maintain a cohesive
 multidisciplinary structure for its health care team;
 (2)  monitor short-term and long-term patient
 diagnostic and therapeutic outcomes; and
 (3)  provide to the department annual reports
 containing aggregate data on short-term and long-term diagnostic
 and therapeutic outcomes as requested or required by the department
 and make those reports available to the public.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 32.071, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 March 1, 2018.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Department of
 State Health Services shall begin awarding designations required by
 Subchapter D, Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act, to health care entities establishing eligibility under that
 subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *