By: Davis of Harris, Zerwas, Burkett H.B. No. 2131 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015; May 18, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the designation of centers of excellence to achieve healthy fetal outcomes in this state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subchapter D to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER D. CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE FOR FETAL DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY Sec. 32.071. DESIGNATION OF CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE FOR FETAL DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY. (a) The department, in consultation with the Perinatal Advisory Council established under Section 241.187, shall designate as centers of excellence for fetal diagnosis and therapy one or more health care entities in this state that provide comprehensive maternal, fetal, and neonatal health care for pregnant women with high-risk pregnancies complicated by one or more fetuses with anomalies, with genetic conditions, or with compromise caused by a pregnancy condition or by exposure. (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission, in consultation with the department and the Perinatal Advisory Council, shall adopt the rules necessary for a health care entity in this state to be designated as a center of excellence for fetal diagnosis and therapy. Sec. 32.072. SUBCOMMITTEE. (a) The department, in consultation with the Perinatal Advisory Council, shall appoint a subcommittee of that advisory council to advise the advisory council and the department on the development of rules related to the designations made by the department under this subchapter. As part of its duties under this subsection, the subcommittee specifically shall advise the advisory council and the department regarding the criteria necessary for a health care entity in this state to receive a designation under this subchapter. (b) The subcommittee must consist of individuals with expertise in fetal diagnosis and therapy. A majority of the members of the subcommittee must practice in those areas in a health profession in this state. The subcommittee may include national and international experts. Sec. 32.073. PRIORITY CONSIDERATIONS FOR CENTER DESIGNATIONS. The rules adopted under Section 32.071(b) must prioritize awarding a designation under this subchapter to a health care entity that: (1) offers fetal diagnosis and therapy through an extensive multi-specialty clinical program that is affiliated and collaborates extensively with a medical school in this state and an associated hospital facility that provides advanced maternal and neonatal care in accordance with the rules established under Section 241.183(a)(1); (2) demonstrates a significant commitment to research in and advancing the field of fetal diagnosis and therapy; (3) offers advanced training programs in fetal diagnosis and therapy; and (4) integrates an advanced fetal care program with a program that provides appropriate long-term monitoring and follow-up care for patients. Sec. 32.074. QUALIFICATIONS FOR DESIGNATION. The rules adopted under Section 32.071(b) must ensure that a designation under this subchapter is based directly on a health care entity's ability to: (1) implement and maintain a cohesive multidisciplinary structure for its health care team; (2) monitor short-term and long-term patient diagnostic and therapeutic outcomes; and (3) provide to the department annual reports containing aggregate data on short-term and long-term diagnostic and therapeutic outcomes as requested or required by the department and make those reports available to the public. SECTION 2. (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section 32.071, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2018. (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, the Department of State Health Services shall begin awarding designations required by Subchapter D, Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, to health care entities establishing eligibility under that subchapter. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *