Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2131 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2131


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of centers of excellence to achieve
 healthy fetal outcomes in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE
 FOR FETAL DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY
 Sec. 32.071.  DESIGNATION OF CENTERS OF EXCELLENCE FOR FETAL
 DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY. (a) The department, in consultation with
 the Perinatal Advisory Council established under Section 241.187,
 shall designate as centers of excellence for fetal diagnosis and
 therapy one or more health care entities or programs in this state,
 including institutions of higher education as defined by Section
 61.003, Education Code, or the programs of those institutions.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission, in consultation with the department and the
 Perinatal Advisory Council, shall adopt the rules necessary for a
 health care entity or program in this state to be designated as a
 center of excellence for fetal diagnosis and therapy.
 Sec. 32.072.  SUBCOMMITTEE. (a) The department, in
 consultation with the Perinatal Advisory Council, shall appoint a
 subcommittee of that advisory council to advise the advisory
 council and the department on the development of rules related to
 the designations made by the department under this subchapter. As
 part of its duties under this subsection, the subcommittee
 specifically shall advise the advisory council and the department
 regarding the criteria necessary for a health care entity or
 program in this state to receive a designation under this
 subchapter.
 (b)  The subcommittee must consist of individuals with
 expertise in fetal diagnosis and therapy. A majority of the members
 of the subcommittee must practice in those areas in a health
 profession in this state. The subcommittee may include national and
 international experts.
 Sec. 32.073.  PRIORITY CONSIDERATIONS FOR CENTER
 DESIGNATIONS. The rules adopted under Section 32.071(b) must
 prioritize awarding a designation under this subchapter to a health
 care entity or program that:
 (1)  offers fetal diagnosis and therapy through an
 extensive multi-specialty clinical program that is affiliated and
 collaborates extensively with a medical school in this state and an
 associated hospital facility that provides advanced maternal and
 neonatal care in accordance with its level of care designation
 received under Section 241.182;
 (2)  demonstrates a significant commitment to research
 in and advancing the field of fetal diagnosis and therapy;
 (3)  offers advanced training programs in fetal
 diagnosis and therapy; and
 (4)  integrates an advanced fetal care program with a
 program that provides appropriate long-term monitoring and
 follow-up care for patients.
 Sec. 32.074.  QUALIFICATIONS FOR DESIGNATION. The rules
 adopted under Section 32.071(b) must ensure that a health care
 entity or program that receives a center of excellence designation
 under this subchapter:
 (1)  provides or is affiliated with a hospital facility
 that provides advanced maternal and neonatal care in accordance
 with its level of care designation received under Section 241.182;
 (2)  implements and maintains a multidisciplinary
 health care team, including maternal fetal medicine specialists,
 pediatric and surgical specialists, neonatologists, nurses with
 specialized maternal and neonatal training, and other ancillary and
 support staff as appropriate to provide maternal, fetal, and
 neonatal services;
 (3)  establishes minimum criteria for medical staff,
 nursing staff, and ancillary and support personnel;
 (4)  measures short-term and long-term patient
 diagnostic and therapeutic outcomes; and
 (5)  provides to the department annual reports
 containing aggregate data on short-term and long-term diagnostic
 and therapeutic outcomes as requested or required by the department
 and makes those reports available to the public.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 32.071, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 March 1, 2017.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2017
 , the Department of
 State Health Services shall begin awarding designations required by
 Subchapter D, Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act, to health care entities establishing eligibility under that
 subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2131 was passed by the House on May
 13, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 4, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2131 on May 28, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 7,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2131 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor