Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2152 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fletcher (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2152
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 8, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2152 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain information concerning
 service members of the state military forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 437, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 437.232 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.232.  CONFIDENTIALITY OF MILITARY PERSONNEL
 INFORMATION. (a) In this section, "military personnel
 information" means a service member's name, home address, rank,
 official title, pay rate or grade, state active duty orders,
 deployment locations, military duty addresses, awards and
 decorations, length of military service, and medical records.
 (b)  A service member's military personnel information is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552.
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.117(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Information is excepted from the requirements of
 Section 552.021 if it is information that relates to the home
 address, home telephone number, emergency contact information, or
 social security number of the following person or that reveals
 whether the person has family members:
 (1)  a current or former official or employee of a
 governmental body, except as otherwise provided by Section 552.024;
 (2)  a peace officer as defined by Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, or a security officer commissioned under
 Section 51.212, Education Code, regardless of whether the officer
 complies with Section 552.024 or 552.1175, as applicable;
 (3)  a current or former employee of the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice or of the predecessor in function of
 the department or any division of the department, regardless of
 whether the current or former employee complies with Section
 552.1175;
 (4)  a peace officer as defined by Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, or other law, a reserve law enforcement
 officer, a commissioned deputy game warden, or a corrections
 officer in a municipal, county, or state penal institution in this
 state who was killed in the line of duty, regardless of whether the
 deceased complied with Section 552.024 or 552.1175;
 (5)  a commissioned security officer as defined by
 Section 1702.002, Occupations Code, regardless of whether the
 officer complies with Section 552.024 or 552.1175, as applicable;
 (6)  an officer or employee of a community supervision
 and corrections department established under Chapter 76 who
 performs a duty described by Section 76.004(b), regardless of
 whether the officer or employee complies with Section 552.024 or
 552.1175;
 (7)  a current or former employee of the office of the
 attorney general who is or was assigned to a division of that office
 the duties of which involve law enforcement, regardless of whether
 the current or former employee complies with Section 552.024 or
 552.1175;
 (8)  a current or former employee of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or of the predecessors in function of the
 department, regardless of whether the current or former employee
 complies with Section 552.1175;
 (9)  a juvenile probation or supervision officer
 certified by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, or the
 predecessors in function of the department, under Title 12, Human
 Resources Code; [or]
 (10)  employees of a juvenile justice program or
 facility, as those terms are defined by Section 261.405, Family
 Code; or
 (11)  a current or former member of the Texas military
 forces, as that term is defined by Section 437.001.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information that is received by a governmental body or
 an officer for public information on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A request for information that was received before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the request was received, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *