Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2162 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Simmons (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2162
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2162 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal regulation of the use of alarm systems;
 authorizing a municipal fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 214.191, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.191.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Alarm system" means a device or system that
 transmits a signal intended to summon police of a municipality in
 response to a burglary. The term includes an alarm that emits an
 audible signal on the exterior of a structure. The term does not
 include an alarm installed on a vehicle, unless the vehicle is used
 for a habitation at a permanent site, or an alarm designed to alert
 only the inhabitants within the premises.
 (2)  "Alarm systems monitor" means a person who acts as
 an alarm systems company under Section 1702.105, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "False alarm" means a notification of possible
 criminal activity reported to law enforcement:
 (A)  that is based solely on electronic
 information remotely received by an alarm systems monitor;
 (B)  that is uncorroborated by eyewitness, video,
 or photographic evidence that an emergency exists; and
 (C)  concerning which an agency of the
 municipality has verified that no emergency exists after an on-site
 inspection of the location from which the notification originated.
 (4) [(2)]  "Permit" means a certificate, license,
 permit, or other form of permission that authorizes a person to
 engage in an action.
 SECTION 2.  Section 214.194(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipal permit fee imposed under this section for an
 alarm system may not exceed the rate of:
 (1)  $50 a year for a residential location; and
 (2)  $250 a year for other alarm system locations.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 214.195, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.195.  NONRENEWAL OR REVOCATION OF PERMIT; [AND]
 TERMINATION OF MUNICIPAL RESPONSE; DISCRIMINATION PROHIBITED.
 SECTION 4.  Section 214.195, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided in Subsections [Subsection] (d) and
 (e), a municipality may not terminate its law enforcement response
 to a residential permit holder because of excess false alarms if the
 false alarm fees are paid in full.
 (e)  A municipality may refuse to respond to a location if
 the location has had more than eight other false alarms during the
 preceding 12-month period.
 SECTION 5.  Section 214.196, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.196.  ON-SITE INSPECTION REQUIRED. A municipality
 may not consider a false alarm to have occurred unless a response is
 made by an agency of the municipality within a reasonable time [30
 minutes of the alarm notification] and the agency determines from
 an inspection of the interior or exterior of the premises that the
 alarm report by an alarm systems monitor was false.
 SECTION 6.  Section 214.197, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.197.  PENALTIES FOR FALSE ALARMS. (a) A
 municipality may impose a penalty on a person who uses an alarm
 system in the municipality for the report [signaling] of a false
 alarm by an alarm systems monitor [a burglar alarm system] if at
 least three other false alarms have occurred at that location
 during the preceding 12-month period.  The amount of the penalty for
 the report [signaling] of a false alarm as described by Section
 214.196 may not exceed:
 (1)  $50, if the location has had more than three but
 fewer than six other false alarms in the preceding 12-month period;
 (2)  $75, if the location has had more than five but
 fewer than eight other false alarms in the preceding 12-month
 period; or
 (3)  $100, if the location has had eight or more other
 false alarms in the preceding 12-month period.
 (b)  A municipality may not impose a penalty authorized under
 Subsection (a) if reasonable visual proof of possible criminal
 activity recorded by an alarm systems monitor is provided to the
 municipality before the inspection of the premises by an agency of
 the municipality.
 (c)  A municipality that adopts an ordinance requiring a
 person to obtain a permit from the municipality before the person
 may use an alarm system in the municipality may impose a penalty,
 not to exceed $250, for the report of a false alarm by an alarm
 systems monitor on a person who has not obtained a permit for the
 alarm system as required by the municipal ordinance.
 (d)  A municipality:
 (1)  may impose a penalty, not to exceed $250, for the
 report of a false alarm on a person not licensed under Chapter 1702,
 Occupations Code, that to any extent is reported or facilitated by
 the unlicensed person; and
 (2)  may not impose a penalty for the report of a false
 alarm on a person licensed under Chapter 1702, Occupations Code.
 (e)  A municipality may not impose or collect any fine, fee,
 or penalty related to a false alarm or alarm system unless the fine,
 fee, or penalty is defined in the ordinance in accordance with this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 7.  The heading to Section 214.198, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.198.  PROCEDURES FOR REDUCING FALSE ALARMS
 [VERIFICATION].
 SECTION 8.  Section 214.200(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipality that does not respond to an alarm system
 signal is not liable for damages that may occur relating to the
 cause of the alarm system signal.
 SECTION 9.  Subchapter F, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.201 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.201.  EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN ALARM SYSTEMS BY OWNER.
 (a) A property owner or an agent of the property owner authorized
 to make decisions regarding the use of the property may elect to
 exclude the municipality from receiving an alarm signal by an alarm
 system located on the owner's property.  A municipality may adopt an
 ordinance that specifies the requirements a property owner must
 satisfy for an election to be made under this section.
 (b)  If an election is made under Subsection (a), the
 municipality:
 (1)  may not impose a fee to obtain a permit to use the
 alarm system;
 (2)  may impose a fee on the property owner, not to
 exceed $250, for each law enforcement response to a signal from the
 alarm system requested by an alarm systems monitor; and
 (3)  may not impose or collect any other fine, penalty,
 or fee, other than a collection fee, related to the alarm system.
 SECTION 10.  With respect to a municipality that on the
 effective date of this Act is a party to a contract with a third
 party to provide alarm system services, the changes in law made by
 this Act apply beginning after the date the contract, including any
 renewals, is terminated or expires by the contract's own terms.
 During the period a contract described by this section is
 effective, the municipality is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *