Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2185 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2185
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the execution of a search warrant for taking a DNA
 specimen.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 18, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 18.065 to read as follows:
 Art. 18.065.  WARRANT FOR DNA SPECIMEN MAY BE EXECUTED IN ANY
 COUNTY. A warrant issued under Article 18.02(10) to collect a DNA
 specimen from a person for the purpose of connecting that person to
 an offense may be executed in any county in this state. A warrant
 executed outside of the county in which the warrant was issued must
 be signed by a judge of a district court with jurisdiction over the
 original offense.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a search warrant issued on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A search warrant issued before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the warrant was issued,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *