Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2186 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Cook, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2186
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2186 By:  Campbell


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 HuffinesX
 KolkhorstX
 RodríguezX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofCollinX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to suicide prevention training for educators in public
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Jason Flatt Act in
 memory of Jonathan Childers.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.451, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1) and (d-2) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The staff development:
 (1)  may include training in:
 (A)  technology;
 (B)  conflict resolution;
 (C)  discipline strategies, including classroom
 management, district discipline policies, and the student code of
 conduct adopted under Section 37.001 and Chapter 37; and
 (D)  preventing, identifying, responding to, and
 reporting incidents of bullying; [and]
 (2)  subject to Subsection (e) and to Section 21.3541 and
 rules adopted under that section, must include training based on
 scientifically based research, as defined by Section 9101, No Child
 Left Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Section 7801), that:
 (A)  related to instruction of students with
 disabilities; and
 (B)  is designed for educators who work primarily
 outside the area of special education; and
 (3)  must include suicide prevention training that must be
 provided:
 (A)  on an annual basis, as part of a new employee
 orientation, to all new school district and open-enrollment charter
 school educators; and
 (B)  to existing school district and open-enrollment
 charter school educators on a schedule adopted by the agency by
 rule.
 (d-1)  The suicide prevention training required by
 Subsection (d)(3) must use a best practice-based program
 recommended by the Department of State Health Services in
 coordination with the agency under Section 161.325, Health and
 Safety Code.
 (d-2)  The suicide prevention training required by
 Subsection (d)(3) may be satisfied through independent review of
 suicide prevention training material that:
 (1)  complies with the guidelines developed by the
 agency; and
 (2)  is offered online.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *