Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2200 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 2200
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 5, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of the Greater Greenspoint Management
 District of Harris County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3803.004(d), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The district will:
 (1)  promote the health, safety, and general welfare of
 residents, employers, employees, and consumers in the district, and
 of the public;
 (2)  provide needed funding for the greater Greenspoint
 area to preserve, maintain, and enhance the economic health and
 vitality of the area as a community and business center; [and]
 (3)  promote the health, safety, welfare, and enjoyment
 of the public by providing pedestrian ways and by landscaping and
 developing certain areas in the district, which are necessary for
 the restoration, preservation, and enhancement of scenic and
 aesthetic beauty; and
 (4)  eliminate unemployment and underemployment and
 develop or expand transportation and commerce by providing or by
 participating with other entities and educational institutions in
 establishing, equipping, financing, and operating workforce
 development, workforce education, and job training opportunities.
 SECTION 2.  Section 3803.051, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3803.051.  BOARD OF DIRECTORS; TERMS. (a) The
 district is governed by a board of 22 directors who serve staggered
 terms of four years, with 11 directors' terms expiring June 1 of
 each odd-numbered year.
 (b)  The board by resolution may increase or decrease the
 number of directors on the board, but only if it is in the best
 interest of the district to do so. The board may not:
 (1)  increase the number of directors to more than 30;
 or
 (2)  decrease the number of directors to fewer than
 nine.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 3803, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Sections 3803.106 and
 3803.107 to read as follows:
 Sec. 3803.106.  PLANS FOR WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT SERVICES.
 (a) The district may develop and implement one or more plans for
 workforce development services. The services may include:
 (1)  job training;
 (2)  workforce education;
 (3)  financing of special educational opportunities;
 or
 (4)  other projects that promote workforce
 development.
 (b)  To assist in implementing a plan for workforce
 development services, the district may:
 (1)  accept a donation, grant, or loan from any person;
 (2)  work with a school at any level;
 (3)  work with any person that provides workforce
 development money or projects; or
 (4)  participate with any other entity.
 Sec. 3803.107.  ANNEXATION OF LAND.  The district may annex
 land as provided by Subchapter J, Chapter 49, Water Code.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 3803, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3803.1515 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3803.1515.  DISBURSEMENTS AND TRANSFERS OF MONEY. The
 board by resolution shall establish the number of directors'
 signatures and the procedure required for a disbursement or
 transfer of the district's money.
 SECTION 5.  Section 3803.154(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The district may correct, add to, or delete an
 assessment from its assessment rolls and collect an assessment due
 under the correction, addition, or deletion if:
 (1)  the district gives [after] notice and hearing in
 the manner required by Section 375.115, Local Government Code; or
 (2)  the change does not increase the amount of
 assessment of any parcel of land.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *