Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2213 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/07/2015

                    By: Metcalf (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2213
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the tow rotation list in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2308.209(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to the unincorporated area of
 a county:
 (1)  with a population of 450,000 [550,000] or more
 that is adjacent to a county with a population of 3.3 million or
 more;
 (2)  with a population of less than 10,000 that is
 located in a national forest; or
 (3)  adjacent to a county described by Subdivision (2)
 that has a population of less than 75,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *