Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2257 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: White of Tyler (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2257
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain emergency services districts that are exempted
 from filing an audit report.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.0821, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a district to which Section
 775.082 applies that:
 (1)  did not have any outstanding bonds secured by ad
 valorem taxes or any outstanding liabilities secured by ad valorem
 taxes having a term of more than one year during the previous fiscal
 year;
 (2)  did not receive more than a total of $250,000 in
 gross receipts from operations, loans, taxes, or contributions
 during the previous fiscal year; and
 (3)  did not have a total of more than $250,000 in cash
 and temporary investments during the previous fiscal year.
 (e)  A district that files compiled financial statements in
 accordance with Subsection (b) and that maintains an Internet
 website shall have posted on the district's website the compiled
 financial statements for the most recent three years.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *