Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2282 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2282
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 2; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for protests and appeals of certain ad
 valorem tax determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The property owner initiating the protest is entitled to
 an opportunity to appear to offer evidence or argument. The
 property owner may offer the owner's [his] evidence or argument by
 affidavit without personally appearing if the owner [he] attests to
 the affidavit before an officer authorized to administer oaths and
 submits the affidavit to the board hearing the protest before it
 begins the hearing on the protest. On receipt of an affidavit, the
 board shall notify the chief appraiser. The chief appraiser [may
 inspect the affidavit and] is entitled to a copy of the affidavit on
 request. The board and the chief appraiser shall review the
 evidence or argument provided by the property owner before the
 hearing on the protest.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 42, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. APPEALS FROM APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD DETERMINATIONS
 IN CERTAIN COUNTIES
 Sec. 42.35.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 applies only to the appeal of an order issued by an appraisal review
 board that is located in a county:
 (1)  that has a population of less than 45,500;
 (2)  that shares a border with a county that has a
 population of 1.5 million or more and is within 200 miles of an
 international border; and
 (3)  through which the Atascosa River flows.
 Sec. 42.36.  APPEALS TO JUSTICE COURT. (a) As an
 alternative to bringing an appeal under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a
 district court as provided by Subchapter B, a property owner may
 bring the appeal to a justice court if:
 (1)  the appeal relates only to a determination of
 appraised value or eligibility for an exemption from taxation; and
 (2)  the amount of taxes due on the portion of the
 taxable value of the property that is in dispute, calculated using
 the preceding year's tax rates, is $10,000 or less.
 (b)  Venue of an action brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) in
 justice court is in any justice precinct in the county in which the
 appraisal review board that issued the order appealed is located.
 (c)  If the justice court determines that the justice court
 does not have jurisdiction of the appeal, the court shall dismiss
 the appeal. In that event, the property owner may appeal the order
 to a district court by filing a petition for review with the
 district court not later than the 30th day after the date of the
 dismissal.
 (d)  Sections 42.21, 42.23, 42.24, 42.25, and 42.26 apply to
 an appeal brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court in
 the same manner as those sections apply to an appeal brought under
 Section 42.01(a)(1) to a district court.
 Sec. 42.37.  REPRESENTATION IN JUSTICE COURT. In an appeal
 brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court, an appraisal
 district may be, but is not required to be, represented by legal
 counsel.
 Sec. 42.38.  JUSTICE COURT JUDGMENT NOT APPEALABLE. The
 final judgment of a justice court in an appeal to the justice court
 brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) may not be appealed by any
 person.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 appeal of an order of an appraisal review board without regard to
 whether the order was issued before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *