Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2282 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2282


 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for protests and appeals of certain ad
 valorem tax determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The property owner initiating the protest is entitled to
 an opportunity to appear to offer evidence or argument. The
 property owner may offer the owner's [his] evidence or argument by
 affidavit without personally appearing if the owner [he] attests to
 the affidavit before an officer authorized to administer oaths and
 submits the affidavit to the board hearing the protest before it
 begins the hearing on the protest. On receipt of an affidavit, the
 board shall notify the chief appraiser. The chief appraiser [may
 inspect the affidavit and] is entitled to a copy of the affidavit on
 request. The board and the chief appraiser shall review the
 evidence or argument provided by the property owner before the
 hearing on the protest.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 42, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. APPEALS FROM APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD DETERMINATIONS
 IN CERTAIN COUNTIES
 Sec. 42.35.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 applies only to the appeal of an order issued by an appraisal review
 board that is located in a county:
 (1)  that has a population of less than 45,500;
 (2)  that shares a border with a county that has a
 population of 1.5 million or more and is within 200 miles of an
 international border; and
 (3)  through which the Atascosa River flows.
 Sec. 42.36.  APPEALS TO JUSTICE COURT. (a) As an
 alternative to bringing an appeal under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a
 district court as provided by Subchapter B, a property owner may
 bring the appeal to a justice court if:
 (1)  the appeal relates only to a determination of
 appraised value or eligibility for an exemption from taxation; and
 (2)  the amount of taxes due on the portion of the
 taxable value of the property that is in dispute, calculated using
 the preceding year's tax rates, is $5,000 or less.
 (b)  Venue of an action brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) in
 justice court is in any justice precinct in the county in which the
 appraisal review board that issued the order appealed is located.
 (c)  If the justice court determines that the justice court
 does not have jurisdiction of the appeal, the court shall dismiss
 the appeal. In that event, the property owner may appeal the order
 to a district court by filing a petition for review with the
 district court not later than the 30th day after the date of the
 dismissal.
 (d)  Sections 42.21, 42.23, 42.24, 42.25, and 42.26 apply to
 an appeal brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court in
 the same manner as those sections apply to an appeal brought under
 Section 42.01(a)(1) to a district court.
 Sec. 42.37.  REPRESENTATION IN JUSTICE COURT. In an appeal
 brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court, an appraisal
 district may be, but is not required to be, represented by legal
 counsel.
 Sec. 42.38.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  On the expiration of Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42,
 Tax Code, as added by this Act, the Office of Court Administration
 of the Texas Judicial System, using existing resources, shall
 conduct a study of that subchapter's effectiveness in increasing
 court efficiency and improving property owners' ability to exercise
 their appeal rights under Chapter 42, Tax Code. Not later than
 December 1, 2022, the office shall issue a report on the study to
 the appropriate standing committees of the house of representatives
 and the senate. The report must include the office's
 recommendation as to whether the legislature, in the next regular
 legislative session following the issuance of the report, should
 enact legislation similar to Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4
 .  An appeal under Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax
 Code, that is pending on September 1, 2021, is governed by that
 subchapter as it existed on August 31, 2021, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 appeal of an order of an appraisal review board without regard to
 whether the order was issued before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2282 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2282 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2282 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 22, Nays
 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor