Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB229 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Guillen, Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 229
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border
 Security; May 18, 2015, reported favorably to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of certain surplus motor vehicles and
 other law enforcement equipment by the Texas Facilities Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2175, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2175.308 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2175.308.  EXCEPTION FOR CERTAIN PROPERTY OF DEPARTMENT
 OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (a) Notwithstanding any conflicting provision
 of this chapter, if the commission determines that this state's
 efforts to secure this state's international border and combat
 transnational crime will sufficiently benefit from the donation of
 the surplus motor vehicles and other law enforcement equipment of
 the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas to a municipal
 or county law enforcement agency in an economically disadvantaged
 area of this state, the commission may transfer the property to the
 agency at a price or for other consideration agreed to by the
 commission and the agency.
 (b)  A law enforcement agency that receives surplus property
 under Subsection (a) may not sell the property before the second
 anniversary of the date the property is received.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *