Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2291 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2291
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the punishment for certain persons convicted
 of the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 43.26(d) and (g), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  An offense under Subsection (a) is a felony of the
 second [third] degree, except that the offense is a felony of the
 first degree if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the
 person has been previously convicted one or more times of an offense
 under that subsection.
 (g)  An offense under Subsection (e) is a felony of the first
 [second] degree.
 SECTION 2.  Section 508.145, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  An inmate serving a sentence for an offense under
 Section 43.26, Penal Code, is not eligible for release on parole
 until the inmate's actual calendar time served, without
 consideration of good conduct time, equals one-half of the inmate's
 sentence.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *