Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2390 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2390
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to civil liability arising from an employee wellness
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 6, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 142A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 142A. LIMITATION ON LIABILITY FOR CERTAIN PROGRAMS
 Sec. 142A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Employee" means a person who, for compensation,
 performs services for an employer under a written or oral contract,
 whether express or implied.
 (2)  "Employee wellness program" means a program
 established by an employer that provides an incentive to an
 employee that promotes wellness or a healthy lifestyle.
 Sec. 142A.002.  LIMITATION ON LIABILITY FOR WELLNESS
 PROGRAMS. (a) A civil action may not be brought against an
 employer for establishing, maintaining, or requiring participation
 in an employee wellness program unless:
 (1)  the program discriminates on the basis of a prior
 medical condition, gender, age, or income level; or
 (2)  the cause of action is based on intentional or
 reckless conduct.
 (b)  This section does not create a cause of action or expand
 an existing cause of action.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *