Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2419 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wray (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 2419
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2015;
 April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the relationship between the Estates Code and the
 former Texas Probate Code.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) This section takes effect only if the Act of
 the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted codes
 becomes law.
 (b)  Section 21.002, Estates Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 21.002.  CONSTRUCTION. (a)  Except as provided by [this
 section,] Section 22.027[,] or [Section] 1002.023, Chapter 311,
 Government Code (Code Construction Act), applies to the
 construction of a provision of this code.
 (b)  This code and the Texas Probate Code, as amended, shall
 be considered one continuous statute, and for the purposes of any
 instrument that refers to the Texas Probate Code, this code shall be
 considered an amendment to the Texas Probate Code [Chapter 311,
 Government Code (Code Construction Act), does not apply to the
 construction of a provision of Subtitle X, Title 2, or Subtitle Y or
 Z, Title 3].
 SECTION 2.  (a) This section takes effect only if the Act of
 the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted codes does
 not become law.
 (b)  Section 21.002, Estates Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This code and the Texas Probate Code, as amended, shall
 be considered one continuous statute, and for the purposes of any
 instrument that refers to the Texas Probate Code, this code shall be
 considered an amendment to the Texas Probate Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *