Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 13, 2015      TO: Honorable Kevin Eltife, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2424 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes, relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority (ABTPA). The bill would amend Section 6A, stipulating that a request by an insurer for a refund made under this section must be made not later than four years after the date the payment was made. The bill would require an insurer to refile a request for a refund with the ABTPA not later than November 1, 2015 if the request was initially made after January 1, 2010, and before September 1, 2015, and was denied solely on the basis of the six month deadline established under Section 11, Chapter 305 (House Bill 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997.Based on the information provided by the Texas Department of Insurance, Department of Motor Vehicles, and the Comptroller's Office, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would not result in a significant fiscal impact to the state. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 454 Department of Insurance, 608 Department of Motor Vehicles   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, NV, TG, AG    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 13, 2015





  TO: Honorable Kevin Eltife, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2424 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Kevin Eltife, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2424 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Kevin Eltife, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce 

 Honorable Kevin Eltife, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2424 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority.), As Engrossed

HB2424 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes, relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority (ABTPA). The bill would amend Section 6A, stipulating that a request by an insurer for a refund made under this section must be made not later than four years after the date the payment was made. The bill would require an insurer to refile a request for a refund with the ABTPA not later than November 1, 2015 if the request was initially made after January 1, 2010, and before September 1, 2015, and was denied solely on the basis of the six month deadline established under Section 11, Chapter 305 (House Bill 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997.Based on the information provided by the Texas Department of Insurance, Department of Motor Vehicles, and the Comptroller's Office, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would not result in a significant fiscal impact to the state.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 454 Department of Insurance, 608 Department of Motor Vehicles

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 454 Department of Insurance, 608 Department of Motor Vehicles

LBB Staff: UP, CL, NV, TG, AG

 UP, CL, NV, TG, AG