By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2424 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015; May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV EltifeX CreightonX EllisX HuffinesX SchwertnerX SeligerX TaylorofGalvestonX WatsonX WhitmireX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 6A, Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes, is amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows: (e) Except as provided by Subsection (f), a request for a refund made under this section must be made not later than four years after the date the payment was made to the authority under Section 10 of this article. (f) This subsection expires September 1, 2017. Notwithstanding Subsection (e) of this section, an insurer must refile a request for a refund under this section with the authority not later than November 1, 2015, if the request was: (1) initially made after January 1, 2010; (2) initially made before September 1, 2015; and (3) denied before September 1, 2015, solely on the basis of the six-month deadline established by Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997. SECTION 2. Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997, is repealed. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *