Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2424


 AN ACT
 relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft
 Prevention Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6A, Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes,
 is amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), a request for a
 refund made under this section must be made not later than four
 years after the date the payment was made to the authority under
 Section 10 of this article.
 (f)  This subsection expires September 1, 2017.
 Notwithstanding Subsection (e) of this section, an insurer must
 refile a request for a refund under this section with the authority
 not later than November 1, 2015, if the request was:
 (1)  initially made after January 1, 2010;
 (2)  initially made before September 1, 2015; and
 (3)  denied before September 1, 2015, solely on the
 basis of the six-month deadline established by Section 11, Chapter
 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session,
 1997.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the
 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the Senate on May
 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED:  _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor