Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2448 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R11001 JRR-F
 By: White of Tyler H.B. No. 2448


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the
 state jail system within the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice.
 (2)  "State jail" means a state jail felony facility
 operated by or under contract with the department under Section
 507.001, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  VOLUNTARY STATE JAIL ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not
 later than December 1, 2015, the department shall convene an
 advisory committee composed of volunteers to review the problems
 facing the state jail system and provide recommendations to guide
 state criminal justice policies and practices relating to state
 jails.
 SECTION 3.  MEMBERS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In recruiting
 volunteers to serve on the advisory committee, the department shall
 include members who are interested parties, including:
 (1)  representatives of the department;
 (2)  representatives of community supervision and
 corrections departments established under Chapter 76, Government
 Code;
 (3)  district or county attorneys in this state;
 (4)  criminal defense attorneys;
 (5)  individuals who have expertise in the state jail
 system and are members of an advocacy or civil rights organization;
 (6)  individuals who have expertise in issues related
 to criminal justice and criminal law;
 (7)  individuals who have expertise in issues related
 to substance abuse and mental health;
 (8)  individuals who were formerly incarcerated in the
 state jail system; and
 (9)  any other individuals or organizations who may be
 helpful in addressing the problems facing the state jail system.
 (b)  The advisory committee shall designate one of the
 members as presiding officer of the committee.
 SECTION 4.  REPORT. (a) Not later than August 1, 2016, the
 advisory committee shall submit to the department, including the
 community justice assistance division of the department, the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the standing committees in the senate and
 house of representatives primarily responsible for criminal
 justice issues a report containing the recommendations developed
 under Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  The department shall make the report submitted under
 Subsection (a) of this section available to the public and shall
 publish the report on its Internet website.
 SECTION 5.  COMPENSATION.  Members of the advisory committee
 serve without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement
 for expenses.
 SECTION 6.  APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY
 COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 7.  EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is
 abolished and this Act expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 8.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.