Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2464 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston) H.B. No. 2464
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of a plumber's license on the retirement or
 death of the plumber.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1301.359(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Section 1301.406, a [A] license,
 endorsement, or registration issued under this chapter is not
 assignable or transferable.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 1301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.406 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.406.  TRANSFER OF LICENSE. (a) On approval by the
 board, a person who holds an unexpired license under this chapter
 and whose license has been held continuously for at least 50
 consecutive years may transfer the license on the date of the
 person's retirement or death to another person who:
 (1)  is related within the second degree by
 consanguinity to the transferor; and
 (2)  holds a license as a journeyman plumber or master
 plumber under this chapter.
 (b)  The application for a license transfer under this
 section must include the transferor's consent and a designation of
 whether the license will transfer on the retirement or death of the
 transferor.
 (c)  The board shall transfer a license to a person who
 submits an application and presents evidence satisfactory to the
 board that:
 (1)  the person meets the requirements under
 Subsections (a)(1) and (a)(2); and
 (2)  the transferor is retired or dead.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt
 rules and prescribe forms necessary to implement the changes in law
 made by Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas State
 Board of Plumbing Examiners shall begin accepting applications for
 the transfer of licenses under Section 1301.406, Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *