Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2466 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Collier H.B. No. 2466


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a safety reimbursement program for
 employers in the Texas workers' compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1031.  SAFETY REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM FOR EMPLOYERS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Program" means the workers' compensation safety
 reimbursement program.
 (2)  "Eligible employer" means any employer, other than
 this state or a political subdivision subject to Subtitle C, who has
 workers' compensation insurance
 coverage and who:
 (A)  employed at least two but not more than 50
 employees on each business day during the preceding calendar year;
 or
 (B)  is a type of employer designated as eligible
 to participate in the program by the commissioner.
 (b)  The commissioner shall establish by rule a safety
 reimbursement program designed to assist eligible employers in the
 creation of safe and healthy workplaces for employees of this
 state, including requirements for employer applications and
 appropriate use of allocated funds.
 (c)  The program shall reimburse an eligible employer for
 expenses incurred by the eligible employer to facilitate a safe and
 healthy workplace for employees of this state.  Reimbursement under
 this section to an eligible employer shall not exceed $5,000 per
 year.  Allowable expenses may include:
 (1)  physical modifications to the worksite;
 (2)  safety equipment, devices, or tools;
 (3)  safety training for employees; and
 (4)  other costs necessary to correct any identified
 safety hazards and protect employees from unsafe working
 conditions.
 (d)  The commissioner by rule shall establish an optional
 preauthorization plan for eligible employers who participate in the
 program.  To participate in the preauthorization plan, an employer
 must submit a proposal to the division, in the manner prescribed by
 the division that describes the workplace modifications and other
 changes that the employer proposes to make to facilitate a safe and
 healthy workplace for employees of this state.  If the division
 approves the employer's proposal, the division shall guarantee
 reimbursement of the expenses incurred by the employer in
 implementing the modifications and changes approved by the division
 unless the division determines that the modifications and changes
 differ materially from the employer's proposal.  Reimbursement
 under this subsection is subject to the limit imposed under
 Subsection (c).
 (e)  From administrative penalties collected by the
 division, the commissioner shall annually deposit the first
 $100,000 into the general revenue fund of the state treasury to the
 credit of the Texas Department of Insurance operating account for
 the purposes of funding the program.  Money for the program may be
 spent by the division, on appropriation by the legislature, only
 for the purposes of implementing this section.
 (f)  Notwithstanding Subsections (a)-(e), this section may
 be implemented only to the extent funds are available.
 (g)  Insurance companies shall also notify eligible
 employers of the availability of the safety reimbursement program
 as provided by commissioner rule.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  ELIGIBILITY FOR SAFETY REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM.
 (a)  The program established under Section 411.1031, Labor Code, as
 added by this Act, takes effect January 1, 2016.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the commissioner of
 workers' compensation shall report to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 members of the legislature regarding the implementation of the
 program established by Section 411.1031, Labor Code, as added by
 this Act, and the results of the program.  The report must include
 any recommendations regarding the continuation of the program,
 including any changes required to enhance the effectiveness of the
 program.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  Except as
 otherwise provided by this Act, if this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect
 September 1, 2015.