Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2472 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2472
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SeligerX
 WestX
 BettencourtX
 BurtonX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 WatsonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the automatic admission of undergraduate students to
 The University of Texas at Austin.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.803(a-3), Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *