Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2532 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 11, 2015      TO: Honorable Troy Fraser, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2532 by Bell (Relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste landfills overlying aquifers.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would define a landfill for purposes of the bill as a Type I municipal solid waste (MSW) landfill entirely designed and constructed on or after October 9, 1993 and not adjacent to a landfill that was designed and constructed in accordance with regulatory standards effective before October 9, 1993.The bill would require the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) to conduct a study of Type I MSW landfills located over aquifers to determine the effectiveness of the regulations that prescribe the design and construction of these landfills. The bill would allow the commission to work with other state agencies, institutions of higher education, nonprofit organizations, private organizations, or business entities to conduct the study. In addition, the bill would require the commission to submit a report on the results and recommendations of the study to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over environmental matters not later than January 1, 2017.  The bill would be effective immediately if it receives the required two-thirds vote in both houses. If not it would be effective on September 1, 2015. The bill's provisions would expire on August 31, 2017.The TCEQ reports that any additional expenses resulting from the bill's required study could be absorbed using existing resources.  Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:582 Commission on Environmental Quality   LBB Staff:  UP, KVe, SZ, TL    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 11, 2015





  TO: Honorable Troy Fraser, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2532 by Bell (Relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste landfills overlying aquifers.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Troy Fraser, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2532 by Bell (Relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste landfills overlying aquifers.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Troy Fraser, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development 

 Honorable Troy Fraser, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2532 by Bell (Relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste landfills overlying aquifers.), As Engrossed

HB2532 by Bell (Relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste landfills overlying aquifers.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would define a landfill for purposes of the bill as a Type I municipal solid waste (MSW) landfill entirely designed and constructed on or after October 9, 1993 and not adjacent to a landfill that was designed and constructed in accordance with regulatory standards effective before October 9, 1993.The bill would require the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) to conduct a study of Type I MSW landfills located over aquifers to determine the effectiveness of the regulations that prescribe the design and construction of these landfills. The bill would allow the commission to work with other state agencies, institutions of higher education, nonprofit organizations, private organizations, or business entities to conduct the study. In addition, the bill would require the commission to submit a report on the results and recommendations of the study to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over environmental matters not later than January 1, 2017.  The bill would be effective immediately if it receives the required two-thirds vote in both houses. If not it would be effective on September 1, 2015. The bill's provisions would expire on August 31, 2017.The TCEQ reports that any additional expenses resulting from the bill's required study could be absorbed using existing resources. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 582 Commission on Environmental Quality

582 Commission on Environmental Quality

LBB Staff: UP, KVe, SZ, TL

 UP, KVe, SZ, TL