Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2532 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    84R17341 JAM-D
 By: Bell H.B. No. 2532
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2532:
 By:  Lozano C.S.H.B. No. 2532


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the effectiveness of regulations governing
 the design and construction of certain Type I municipal solid waste
 landfills overlying aquifers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (2)  "Landfill" means a Type I municipal solid waste
 landfill:
 (A)  the entirety of which was designed and
 constructed in accordance with regulatory standards effective on or
 after October 9, 1993; and
 (B)  that is not adjacent to a landfill that was
 designed and constructed in accordance with regulatory standards
 effective before October 9, 1993.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study to determine the
 effectiveness of the regulations governing the design and
 construction of landfills located over aquifers in this state. The
 study must:
 (1)  determine whether landfills located over aquifers
 are leaking;
 (2)  based on a review of groundwater monitoring data
 collected and reported by statewide landfill operators and any
 other relevant information, determine if any leakage from landfills
 built over aquifers has seeped into or contaminated the groundwater
 underlying the landfills;
 (3)  include any recommendations necessary for
 improving the effectiveness of the regulations governing the design
 and construction of landfills located over aquifers, including
 recommendations to:
 (A)  prevent or reduce leakage from landfills
 overlying aquifers; and
 (B)  protect aquifers underlying the landfills;
 and
 (4)  be submitted for independent peer review.
 (c)  The commission may work with other state agencies,
 institutions of higher education, nonprofit organizations, private
 organizations, or business entities to conduct the study.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the commission shall
 submit a report on the results and recommendations of the study to
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing
 committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over environmental
 matters.
 (e)  Applications and permits for Type I municipal solid
 waste landfills may not be postponed or delayed pending the results
 of the study.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.