Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2565 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 24, 2015      TO: Honorable Abel Herrero, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2565 by Krause (relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would create a commission to study and review all penal laws of this state other than certain criminal offenses. The bill would require the commission to make recommendations to the Legislature regarding the repeal of certain laws that are identified as being unnecessary, unclear, duplicative, overly broad, or otherwise insufficient to serve the intended purpose of the law.  The bill would require the commission to report findings to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Supreme Court of Texas, the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals, and the standing committees of the House of Representatives and the Senate with primary jurisdiction over criminal justice no later than November 1, 2016. The bill would expire and abolish the commission on December 31, 2016. This bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of each house; if not, it will take effect on September 1, 2015. The Office of Court Administration, Office of the Governor, and the Legislative Budget Board estimate that all duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished within existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 301 Office of the Governor   LBB Staff:  UP, KJo, EP, LBe    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 24, 2015





  TO: Honorable Abel Herrero, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2565 by Krause (relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Abel Herrero, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2565 by Krause (relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Abel Herrero, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Abel Herrero, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2565 by Krause (relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2565 by Krause (relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would create a commission to study and review all penal laws of this state other than certain criminal offenses. The bill would require the commission to make recommendations to the Legislature regarding the repeal of certain laws that are identified as being unnecessary, unclear, duplicative, overly broad, or otherwise insufficient to serve the intended purpose of the law.  The bill would require the commission to report findings to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Supreme Court of Texas, the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals, and the standing committees of the House of Representatives and the Senate with primary jurisdiction over criminal justice no later than November 1, 2016. The bill would expire and abolish the commission on December 31, 2016. This bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of each house; if not, it will take effect on September 1, 2015. The Office of Court Administration, Office of the Governor, and the Legislative Budget Board estimate that all duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 301 Office of the Governor

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 301 Office of the Governor

LBB Staff: UP, KJo, EP, LBe

 UP, KJo, EP, LBe