Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2621 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2621


 AN ACT
 relating to the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0827 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0827.  ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR BLINN JUNIOR COLLEGE
 DISTRICT. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to the
 members of the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College
 District elected or appointed under other provisions of this
 subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a
 branch campus of the district with a student enrollment greater
 than 10,000 is located shall appoint two members to serve on the
 district's board of trustees. If an advisory committee for a branch
 campus has been previously established, the members must be
 selected from the membership of the advisory committee.
 (b)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section serve two-year terms and may be appointed to serve
 successive terms. The commissioners court shall appoint initial
 members to serve a term beginning December 1, 2015.
 (c)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section may participate in the decision-making of the board to the
 same extent as any other member of the board except that members of
 the board appointed under this section by the commissioners court
 of a county that is not located in the Blinn Junior College
 District:
 (1)  may participate in the decision-making of the
 board only in matters not related to the imposition of a tax or the
 distribution of revenue raised from a tax;
 (2)  are counted for purposes of determining whether a
 quorum of the board is present only for the purpose of Subdivision
 (1); and
 (3)  may not serve as an officer of the board of
 trustees.
 (d)  Unless this section is continued in effect by the
 legislature, this section expires on December 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  The commissioners court of each county to which
 Section 130.0827, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies
 shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the
 Blinn Junior College District under that section not later than
 December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2621 was passed by the House on May 8,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 4, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2621 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 6,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2621 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor