Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2645 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Blanco, Alvarado, Fallon H.B. No. 2645
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2645 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of certain offenses involving family
 violence and to the violation of certain court orders or conditions
 of bond in a family violence, sexual assault or abuse, or stalking
 case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.371 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.371.  EVIDENCE IN PROSECUTIONS OF CERTAIN OFFENSES
 INVOLVING FAMILY VIOLENCE. (a)  This article applies to a
 proceeding in the prosecution of a defendant for an offense, or for
 an attempt or conspiracy to commit an offense, that is committed
 under:
 (1)  Section 22.01 or 22.02, Penal Code, against a
 person whose relationship to or association with the defendant is
 described by Section 71.0021(b), 71.003, or 71.005, Family Code; or
 (2)  Section 25.07 or 25.072, Penal Code, if the
 offense is based on a violation of an order or a condition of bond in
 a case involving family violence.
 (b)  In the prosecution of an offense described by Subsection
 (a), subject to the Texas Rules of Evidence or other applicable law,
 each party may offer testimony or other evidence of all relevant
 facts and circumstances that would assist the trier of fact in
 determining whether the actor committed the offense described by
 Subsection (a), including testimony or evidence regarding the
 nature of the relationship between the actor and the alleged
 victim.
 SECTION 2.  Section 25.07(a), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if, in violation of a
 condition of bond set in a family violence, sexual assault or abuse,
 or stalking case and related to the safety of a victim or the safety
 of the community, an order issued under Article 17.292, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, an order issued under Section 6.504, Family
 Code, Chapter 83, Family Code, if the temporary ex parte order has
 been served on the person, or Chapter 85, Family Code, or an order
 issued by another jurisdiction as provided by Chapter 88, Family
 Code, the person knowingly or intentionally:
 (1)  commits family violence or an act in furtherance
 of an offense under Section 22.011, 22.021, or 42.072;
 (2)  communicates:
 (A)  directly with a protected individual or a
 member of the family or household in a threatening or harassing
 manner;
 (B)  a threat through any person to a protected
 individual or a member of the family or household; or
 (C)  in any manner with the protected individual
 or a member of the family or household except through the person's
 attorney or a person appointed by the court, if the violation is of
 an order described by this subsection and the order prohibits any
 communication with a protected individual or a member of the family
 or household;
 (3)  goes to or near any of the following places as
 specifically described in the order or condition of bond:
 (A)  the residence or place of employment or
 business of a protected individual or a member of the family or
 household; or
 (B)  any child care facility, residence, or school
 where a child protected by the order or condition of bond normally
 resides or attends;
 (4)  possesses a firearm; [or]
 (5)  harms, threatens, or interferes with the care,
 custody, or control of a pet, companion animal, or assistance
 animal that is possessed by a person protected by the order; or
 (6)  removes, attempts to remove, or otherwise tampers
 with the normal functioning of a global positioning monitoring
 system.
 SECTION 3.  Section 25.07(b), Penal Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (2-a) to read as follows:
 (2-a)  "Global positioning monitoring system" has the
 meaning assigned by Article 17.49, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The change in law made by this Act in adding
 Article 38.371, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies to the
 admissibility of evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences
 on or after the effective date of this Act. The admissibility of
 evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act in amending Section
 25.07, Penal Code, applies only to an offense committed on or after
 the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For purposes of this subsection, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *