Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2655 Engrossed / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 2655     84R17826 MCK-F   By: Frank; Guillen (Kolkhorst)         Health & Human Services         5/11/2015         Engrossed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 2655
84R17826 MCK-F By: Frank; Guillen (Kolkhorst)
 Health & Human Services
 5/11/2015
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 2655

84R17826 MCK-F

By: Frank; Guillen (Kolkhorst)

 

Health & Human Services

 

5/11/2015

 

Engrossed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) administers many different types of care within the state's foster care system. One of the goals of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program, otherwise known as kinship care, is to keep children in the system with family members. H.B. 2655 seeks to ensure that children achieve permanency in their kinship placements as quickly and efficiently as possible.   The bill amends Chapter 264 of the Family Code as it relates to day care assistance and requires DFPS to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver program.   DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill.   H.B. 2655 amends current law relating to requiring the Department of Family and Protective Services to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter I, Chapter 264, Family Code, by adding Section 264.761, as follows:    Sec. 264.761. STUDY OF PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program created by this subchapter and make recommendations to the legislature for improving the program. Requires that the recommended improvements be designed to minimize the number of placements for each child, maximize efficiency in the distribution of any monetary or other assistance for which caregivers qualify, facilitate a safe and permanent exit from the managing conservatorship of DFPS in as timely a fashion as possible, and assist caregivers in obtaining the verification necessary to qualify for foster care maintenance reimbursement. Authorizes the recommendations to include increases in the amount of assistance and the identification of automated or other processes designed to speed the payment of assistance.   (b) Requires DFPS to report its findings and recommendations to the legislature not later than January 1, 2017.   (c) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2017.   SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2015.     

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) administers many different types of care within the state's foster care system. One of the goals of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program, otherwise known as kinship care, is to keep children in the system with family members. H.B. 2655 seeks to ensure that children achieve permanency in their kinship placements as quickly and efficiently as possible.

 

The bill amends Chapter 264 of the Family Code as it relates to day care assistance and requires DFPS to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver program.

 

DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill.

 

H.B. 2655 amends current law relating to requiring the Department of Family and Protective Services to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter I, Chapter 264, Family Code, by adding Section 264.761, as follows: 

 

Sec. 264.761. STUDY OF PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated caregiver placement program created by this subchapter and make recommendations to the legislature for improving the program. Requires that the recommended improvements be designed to minimize the number of placements for each child, maximize efficiency in the distribution of any monetary or other assistance for which caregivers qualify, facilitate a safe and permanent exit from the managing conservatorship of DFPS in as timely a fashion as possible, and assist caregivers in obtaining the verification necessary to qualify for foster care maintenance reimbursement. Authorizes the recommendations to include increases in the amount of assistance and the identification of automated or other processes designed to speed the payment of assistance.

 

(b) Requires DFPS to report its findings and recommendations to the legislature not later than January 1, 2017.

 

(c) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2017.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2015.