Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2696 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2696


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on reducing workplace violence against nurses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 105.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (3), (4), (5), and (6) to read as
 follows:
 (3)  "Freestanding emergency medical care facility"
 means a facility licensed under Chapter 254.
 (4)  "Home health agency" means a home and community
 support services agency licensed under Chapter 142.
 (5)  "Hospital" means a general or special hospital
 licensed under Chapter 241, a private mental hospital licensed
 under Chapter 577, or a hospital that is maintained or operated by
 this state or an agency of this state.
 (6)  "Nursing facility" means an institution licensed
 under Chapter 242.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 105, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 105.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.009.  STUDY ON WORKPLACE VIOLENCE AGAINST NURSES.
 (a)  To the extent existing funding is available, the nursing
 resource section established under Section 105.002 may conduct a
 study on workplace violence against nurses in hospitals,
 freestanding emergency medical care facilities, nursing
 facilities, and home health agencies. A study conducted under this
 section must:
 (1)  distinguish between verbal and physical violence;
 (2)  determine the practice areas, environments, and
 settings in which verbal or physical violence is likely to occur;
 (3)  identify practices that prevent or reduce verbal
 and physical violence against nurses;
 (4)  survey nurses regarding the type and frequency of
 verbal and physical violence the nurses have experienced in the
 preceding year and throughout the nurses' careers; and
 (5)  survey hospitals, freestanding emergency medical
 care facilities, nursing facilities, and home health agencies
 regarding the occurrence of verbal and physical violence against
 nurses and specific strategies implemented to prevent verbal and
 physical violence, including:
 (A)  required reporting of verbal and physical
 violence;
 (B)  reporting of physical assaults to law
 enforcement; and
 (C)  implementation of a violence prevention plan
 and the contents of and personnel covered by the plan.
 (b)  The nursing resource section may contract with an
 independent researcher to conduct all or part of the study.
 (c)  The nursing advisory committee established by Section
 104.0155 shall serve as the oversight committee for the study.
 (d)  To the extent possible, the nursing resource section
 shall cooperate with the department and the Texas Board of Nursing
 to conduct the study and coordinate the surveys under this section
 with surveys required by other provisions of law.
 (e)  If the nursing resource section conducts a study under
 this section, not later than December 1, 2016, the nursing resource
 section shall complete the study and publish the study findings.
 (f)  This section expires December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 Section 105.009, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2696 was passed by the House on May
 11, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 112, Nays 22, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2696 on May 28, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 6,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2696 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor