Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2718 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2718
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2718 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a program to allow faith- and community-based
 organizations to offer supplemental assistance to certain
 recipients of public assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02482 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02482.  FAITH- AND COMMUNITY-BASED ORGANIZATION
 SUPPORT FOR CERTAIN PERSONS RECEIVING PUBLIC ASSISTANCE. (a) In
 this section, "community-based organization" and "faith-based
 organization" have the meanings assigned by Section 535.001.
 (b)  The commission shall establish a program under which
 faith- and community-based organizations may, on the request of the
 applicant, contact and offer supplemental assistance to an
 applicant for benefits under:
 (1)  the financial assistance program under Chapter 31,
 Human Resources Code;
 (2)  the medical assistance program under Chapter 32,
 Human Resources Code;
 (3)  the supplemental nutrition assistance program
 under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code; or
 (4)  the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
 Health and Safety Code.
 (c)  At the time of application for benefits described by
 Subsection (b), an applicant must:
 (1)  be informed about and given the opportunity to
 enroll in the program; and
 (2)  be informed that enrolling in the program will not
 affect the person's eligibility for benefits.
 (d)  The commission shall develop a procedure under which
 faith- and community-based organizations may apply to participate
 in the program.
 (e)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to
 implement the program established under this section, including
 rules that:
 (1)  describe the types of faith- and community-based
 organizations that may apply to participate in the program and the
 qualifications and standards of service required of a participating
 organization;
 (2)  facilitate contact between a person who enrolls in
 the program and a faith- and community-based organization
 participating in the program that provides supplemental services
 that may be of assistance to the person;
 (3)  establish processes for the suspension,
 revocation, and periodic renewal of an organization's
 participation in the program, as appropriate;
 (4)  establish methods to ensure the confidentiality
 and appropriate use of applicant information shared with a
 participating organization; and
 (5)  permit a person enrolled in the program to
 terminate the person's enrollment in the program.
 (f)  In establishing the program, the commission may solicit
 expertise and assistance from interested persons, including faith-
 and community-based organizations, and may establish a temporary
 work group to provide input and assistance. This subsection
 expires, and any work group established under this subsection is
 abolished, September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2016.
 * * * * *