Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2786 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 29, 2015      TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2786 by Springer (Relating to incentives for the production of video games.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2786, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 29, 2015





  TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2786 by Springer (Relating to incentives for the production of video games.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2786 by Springer (Relating to incentives for the production of video games.), As Introduced

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development 

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2786 by Springer (Relating to incentives for the production of video games.), As Introduced

HB2786 by Springer (Relating to incentives for the production of video games.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2786, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2786, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $28,965,771    


2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $28,965,771

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 $0 0.0   2017 $0 0.0   2018 $0 0.0   2019 $0 0.0   2020 $28,965,771 (8.0)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 $0 0.0   2017 $0 0.0   2018 $0 0.0   2019 $0 0.0   2020 $28,965,771 (8.0)  


2016 $0 0.0
2017 $0 0.0
2018 $0 0.0
2019 $0 0.0
2020 $28,965,771 (8.0)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Government Code to rename the Texas Moving Image Incentive Program to the Texas Video Game Industry Incentive Program and eliminate certain productions from eligibility for incentives. The bill would codify certain policies regarding maximum award limits. The bill would require a biennial report from the Comptroller. The Texas Video Game Industry Incentive Program would expire on August 31, 2019. Additionally, the bill would abolish the Film Archive Program. Based on the LBB's analysis of the Office of the Governor, duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill would have no significant fiscal impact in the 2016-17 biennium.The Texas Workforce Commission and the Comptroller of Public Accounts indicate the costs associated with implementation of the bill could be absorbed with existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2015. 

Methodology

According to the Office of the Governor, there would be the immediate elimination of roughly three-quarters of the uses of the program, and staff would decline as the program sunsets. The LBB assumes there will be sufficient applications for the Texas Video Game Industry Incentive Program to continue at the same level as the former Texas Moving Image Incentive Program (MIIP). In 2020, when the program is abolished, the savings is estimated to be $1,236,061 each fiscal year using half of the total agency's administrative costs for the film and music marketing activities, including employee benefits in the 2014-15 biennium. There would also be a reduction of 8.0 FTEs associated with the program, based on the number of FTEs for the MIIP.The LBB assumes the Texas Video Game Industry Incentive Program would provide grants at the same level as the MIIP. Using this assumption, in 2020 when the program is abolished, there will be a savings of $27,729,710 in General Revenue, based on the average incentive grant awards over the past three biennia.

Local Government Impact

The Office of the Governor reported that local governments may see a decrease in film, television, and commercial production within the state annually. Panola College and Southwest Texas Junior College indicate the costs associated with implementation of the bill could be absorbed with existing resources. Travis County and El Paso County reported no fiscal impact is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 301 Office of the Governor, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

301 Office of the Governor, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CL, EP, LBe, KVe, JLi, ED

 UP, CL, EP, LBe, KVe, JLi, ED