Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2789 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Raymond, Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2789
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2789 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to trauma-informed care training for certain employees of
 state supported living centers and intermediate care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 161.088 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.088.  TRAUMA-INFORMED CARE TRAINING. (a) The
 department shall develop or adopt trauma-informed care training for
 employees who work directly with individuals with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities in state supported living centers and
 intermediate care facilities. The executive commissioner by rule
 shall require new employees to complete the training before working
 with individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
 (b)  The training required under this section may be provided
 through an Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *